Okafo, Benjamin Anisiobi (CPSO#: 43172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Benjamin Okafo
Medicine Professional Corporation
210 Memorial Avenue, Suite 112B
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone: (705) 325-3603
Fax: (705) 325-5483
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN ANISIOBI OKAFO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKAFO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Apr 1989
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2000