Okello, Clement Dove (CPSO#: 107855)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Makerere Univ, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 12 Aug 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016