Oketch, Consolata Anyango (CPSO#: 87776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:University of Nairobi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carea Community Health Centre
115 Grassmere Ave
Oshawa ON  L1H 3X7
Phone: (905) 723-0036
Fax: (905) 723-3391
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. A. Oketch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Oketch ( CPSO# 87776 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Community Health Centre
115 Grassmere Avenue
Oshawa ON  L1H 3X7
Phone Number: (905) 723-0036

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONSOLATA ANYANGO OKETCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKETCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009