Okubo, Nobuhiko (CPSO#: 98107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 St. Matthews Road, Unit M068
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-4443
Fax: (416) 461-4777
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

70 University Ave, Suite 120
Toronto ON  M5J 2M4
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 477-2015
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

160 Main Street South, Unit 4
Brampton ON  L6W 2E1
Canada
Phone: (905) 450-2700
Fax: (905) 450-2707
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOBUHIKO OKUBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKUBO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2015