Okun, Nanette Bell (CPSO#: 60158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
3rd Floor Suite 3 917
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4417
Fax: (416) 586-4792
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nanette Okun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Okun ( CPSO# 60158 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Suite 3-917
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4417

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANETTE BELL OKUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2001