Okwechime, Josephine Nkechi (CPSO#: 81872)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Benin, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2005 to 30 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007