Olasoko, Stephen Adejare (CPSO#: 75718)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ibadan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2001