Olearczyk, Bohdan (CPSO#: 62077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2209 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1N4
Phone: (416) 762-6346
Fax: (416) 769-8659
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olearczyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Stegnajic ( CPSO# 64035 )
Dr. B. Olearczyk ( CPSO# 62077 )

Business Address:
201 - 2209 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1M8
Phone Number: (416) 762-6346

Business Address:
407 - 658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (416) 462-2700

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOHDAN OLEARCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLEARCZYK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1991