Oliva, Maria Angelica Gicaro (CPSO#: 83723)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2005 to 08 Dec 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008