Oliveira, Keith Frank (CPSO#: 26798)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 24 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Dec 2014