Oliver Fernandez, Alejandro (CPSO#: 86738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
640 Ross Ave E
Suite F
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone: (705) 267-1744
Fax: (705) 267-1899
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Oliver Fernandez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oliver Fernandez ( CPSO# 86738 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
640 Ross Avenue East
Suite F
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone Number: (705) 267-1744

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEJANDRO OLIVER FERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER FERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008