Oliver, Richard Neil (CPSO#: 24876)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 9 Vandalay Crescent, Kingston, ON K7L 5T9
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015