Olivier, Andre Daniel (CPSO#: 76586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Monfort Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4509
Fax: (613) 907-8004
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Olivier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Olivier ( CPSO# 76586 )

Business Address:
Saint-Vincent Hospital
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE DANIEL OLIVIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001