Olivier, Kary Gail (CPSO#: 70140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone: (705) 524-7419
Fax: (705) 524-9087
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kary Olivier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Olivier ( CPSO# 70140 )

Business Address:
555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone Number: (705) 524-7419

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARY GAIL OLIVIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998