Olivier, Marie-Jo (CPSO#: 73575)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2002