Olivieri, Nancy Fern (CPSO#: 51311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
EN 13-222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3213
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 29 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY FERN OLIVIERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVIERI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1986