Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ollson, Gary LeRoy (CPSO#: 32622)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Ollson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 19 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital 8 Richmond Park Drive Napanee, ON K7R 2Z4
Date Received: 30 Apr 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014