Olowoyeye, John Olubunmi Olanipekun (CPSO#: 44074)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002