Olsen, Jeanine (CPSO#: 29737)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 404 220 Dundas Street West Whitby ON L1N 8M7
Date Received: 09 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2014