Olsen, Kristina Lynn (CPSO#: 70264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterview Medical Centre
464 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V1
Phone: (289) 245-1071
Fax: (289) 245-1486
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. KL Olsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Olsen ( CPSO# 70264 )

Business Address:
464 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V1
Phone Number: (289) 245-1071

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINA LYNN OLSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1998