Olsson, Larry Sven Morten Daniel (CPSO#: 25521)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry Olsson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: R R 7 2517 Nixon Road Simcoe, ON N3Y 4K6
Instructions: Patients must provide written consent along with payment for copies of medical records.
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014