Oluma, Elias Tilahun (CPSO#: 89751)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2011