Olupona, Titilayo I (CPSO#: 86791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Integra Health Center
Exchange Tower, 1320-130 King St
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Phone: 416 777 9355
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Exchange Tower, 1320-130 King St
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Canada
Phone: 4167779355
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Titilayo Olupona Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Olupona ( CPSO# 86791 )

Business Address:
Integra Health Centre
1320 - 130 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Phone Number: (416) 777-9355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TITILAYO I OLUPONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLUPONA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014