Omar, Mohammad Ellyas (CPSO#: 101155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River hospital
Hospitalist
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
Hospitalist
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Listowel Memorial Hospital
Emergency
255 Elizabeth St E
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 291-3120
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Ellyas Omar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Omar ( CPSO# 101155)

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
Emergency
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Business Address:
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 745-2327

Business Address:
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9
Phone Number: (519) 748-2327

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ELLYAS OMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015