Omer, Saeed Adem (CPSO#: 79823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Eritrean

Education:University of Khartoum, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Center
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50554
Fax: (905) 494-6481
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Omer ( CPSO# 79823 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAEED ADEM OMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004