Omole, Mojola (CPSO#: 86905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G1G3
Phone: 519 7423611
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOJOLA OMOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013