Onalan, Orhan (CPSO#: 90203)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Hacettepe University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 11 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 29 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2009