Ondiveeran, Hari Kumar (CPSO#: 70988)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Malaya, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 14 Nov 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 11 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

McMaster University, 12 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009