Ong, Alan Pang Yean (CPSO#: 69191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
790 Bay Street
Suite 800
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 837-8181
Fax: (647) 427-4928
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13291 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 507
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 488-6980
Fax: (416) 488-3998
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

390 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 208
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 709-9696
Fax: (905) 709-9764
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Ong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ong ( CPSO# 69191 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Business Address:
Suite 507
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2

Business Address:
Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 837-8181

Business Address:
Suite 208
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN PANG YEAN ONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000