Ong, Dennis Dy (CPSO#: 64393)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the Philippines, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997