Ong, Geraldine Hat Huong Thu (CPSO#: 105062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Echocardiography
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5201
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALDINE HAT HUONG THU ONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016