Onishenko, Donna Kathleen (CPSO#: 62100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
192 Riddell Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 8M7
Phone: (519) 537-5044
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA KATHLEEN ONISHENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONISHENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991