Onorato, Linda (CPSO#: 70263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Onorato Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Onorato ( CPSO# 70263 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (289) 684-0552

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (289) 684-0552

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA ONORATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONORATO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005