Onufrievich, Irina Alexandrovna (CPSO#: 82289)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 23 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 2005