Onuska, Frank Patrick (CPSO#: 59693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elmira Medical Centre
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone: (519) 669-5493
Fax: (519) 669-5901
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank P. Onuska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Onuska ( CPSO# 59693 )

Business Address:
Elmira Medical Centre
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone Number: (519) 669-5496


Corporation Name: Drs. Craig, Norris, Jones, Onuska and Schwindt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Onuska ( CPSO# 59693 )
Dr. I. Norris ( CPSO# 52498 )
Dr. G. Jones ( CPSO# 55549 )
Dr. J. Craig ( CPSO# 32717 )
Dr. J. Schwindt ( CPSO# 102110)

Business Address:
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone Number: (519) 669-5493

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK PATRICK ONUSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONUSKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989