Onyett, Agnes Heather (CPSO#: 43314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Gibson Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 4R2
Phone: 613-547-6536
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGNES HEATHER ONYETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONYETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1985