Onyshko, Daniel John (CPSO#: 63525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 810
129 2nd Avenue South West
Minnedosa MB  R0J 1E0
Phone: (204) 867-2722
Fax: (204) 867-2986

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 Sep 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 10 Sep 2009 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 10, 2009, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Daniel John Onyshko,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Onyshko to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  I, Dr. Daniel John Onyshko, have ceased to practise medicine in the
                  Province of Ontario, until such time as the conditions in my undertaking
                  dated September 10, 2009, have been met and the College permits me to
                  resume practice.