Ooi, Daylily Soon (CPSO#: 32430)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Singapore, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. T.C. and D.S. Ooi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus 1967 Riverside Dr Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 03 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017