Oommen, Ashok (CPSO#: 69825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiogenix Medical Centre
8250 Decarie Boulevard suite 410
Montreal QC  H4P 2P5
Phone: (514) 731-2491

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHOK OOMMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OOMMEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 1996 to 05 May 1996
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1996