Oommen, Samuel Parayil (CPSO#: 66782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 688-3735
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samuel Oommen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Oommen ( CPSO# 66782 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 674-3181

Business Address:
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Phone Number: (800) 251-6543

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL PARAYIL OOMMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OOMMEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1995