Oosterholt, Adrian Geradus Hermanus (CPSO#: 33419)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 May 1995
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 May 1995
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 1995
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 May 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 2000

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 May 1995
Summary:

In May 1995, Dr. Oosterholt pleaded guilty to a charge professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 
548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient.    The Discipline Committee accepted this plea 
and found Dr. Oosterholt guilty of professional misconduct.    Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Oosterholt was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. 
 
   2. Dr. Oosterholt s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of 360 days. 
 
   3. The latter 180 days of this period of suspension were themselves to be suspended, provided that Dr. Oosterholt 
      complied with the following conditions: 
 
      (i)   he was to enter, at his own expense, a treatment program for professionals who sexually abuse patients, 
            acceptable to the Registrar; 
 
      (ii)  he was to enter, at his own expense, a program of interpersonal psychotherapy acceptable to the Registrar; 
 
      (iii) his therapists were to provide periodic reports, the frequency of which was to be determined by the 
            Registrar, confirming Dr. Oosterholt's compliance with both of the programs outlined in sections 3(i) and 
            3(ii) above, and describing his progress; and 
 
      (iv)  Dr. Oosterholt was to complete both of the programs cited in sections 3(i) and 3(ii) above, to the 
            satisfaction of the Registrar. 
 
   4. In the event that Dr. Oosterholt failed to meet any of the conditions cited above, the Committee ordered that the 
      remaining 180 days of the period of suspension were to commence on a date to be determined by the Registrar. 
 
   5. The Registrar was also to impose a restriction upon Dr. Oosterholt's licence to practice, such that he not be permitted 
      to examine any female patient without the presence of another adult female, female health professional or spouse.   
      This restriction was to commence immediately, and to continue until such time as Dr. Oosterholt successfully 
      completed the treatment program outlined in section 3(i) above, and until his therapist provided an opinion to the 
      Registrar that such limitation should expire. 
 
In the event that Dr. Oosterholt was unable to engage a locum tenens before 15 October 1995, thus delaying the 
commencement of his period of suspension until that date, he agreed to comply with the conditions outlined in paragraph 3 
above, and initiate therapy as soon as possible after the conclusion of this Hearing. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 19, 1995