Opadele, Temilolu Olabanji (CPSO#: 88009)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Benin, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2008 to 20 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History