Opavsky, Mary Anne (CPSO#: 64218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Ext. 5797
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Anne Opavsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Opavsky ( CPSO# 64218 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ANNE OPAVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPAVSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991