Opeitum, Abiola Abiodun (CPSO#: 62703)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: Oshuntoye, Abiola Abiodun (used until: 25 Jun 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ife, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Dada 505 Rymal Road East Hamilton, ON L8W 3X1 Telephone: 905-544-2974 and 905-544-2979
Instructions: If Dr. Dada is unable to assist please telephone Dr. Opetium at 281-746-7085
Date Received: 26 Feb 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015