Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ophel, Judith May (CPSO#: 63149)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1990 to 28 Feb 1991
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Jan 2005 to 11 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2005