Opie, John William (CPSO#: 65011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave East, Hamilton ON
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33112
Fax: (905) 521-6017
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Care
237 Barton St East
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46368
Fax: (905) 527-7051
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Opie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Opie ( CPSO# 65011 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM OPIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993