Oppenheimer, Lawrence William (CPSO#: 61987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Obstetrics and Gynecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8055
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence Oppenheimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Oppenheimer ( CPSO# 61987 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE WILLIAM OPPENHEIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPPENHEIMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1991