Oprea, Petra (CPSO#: 82200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
181 Greenlane East, unit 2
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-0404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petra Oprea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oprea ( CPSO# 82200 )

Business Address:
181 Greenlane East
Unit 2
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 868-0404

Business Address:
York Medical Clinic
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETRA OPREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPREA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2005 to 18 May 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 May 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008