Orbeck, Kenneth William (CPSO#: 19737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1500 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z2
Phone: (613) 738-7660
Fax: (613) 738-8614
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH WILLIAM ORBECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORBECK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1965
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Apr 1993
Summary:

 In April 1993, Dr. Orbeck pleaded guilty to a charge of  professional misconduct for failing to 
 provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report requested by a patient(s authorized 
 agent in respect of an examination and treatment as defined in s.27(27) of Ontario Regulation 
 448/80.  The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Orbeck(s guilty plea, and found him guilty of 
 professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27), 448/80.  Furthermore, the Discipline Committee 
 found Dr. Orbeck guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional as defined in s.27(32) of Ontario Regulation 
 448/80.  The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Orbeck be reprimanded, with the fact 
 of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;

2.	Dr. Orbeck be fined the maximum amount of 
 $5,000;

3.	The imposition of the fine be suspended provided Dr. Orbeck is not proven guilty of 
 professional misconduct for failing to provide a report to a patient or to a patient(s 
 representative or for unprofessional conduct related to a failure to cooperate with the College, 
 within a five year period from the date that this order becomes final; and

4.	Should such a 
 finding result in the suspension of this fine being vacated, failure to pay shall result in the 
 Registrar suspending Dr. Orbeck(s licence to practise medicine until such time as the fine is 
 paid.

Dr. Orbeck waived his right to appeal and the reprimand was administered.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 23 Apr 1993

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

SCERP Summary:

On August 17, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required general family medicine physician, Dr. Kenneth William Orbeck, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Orbeck to:

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months;

• Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the next available e-learning modules, Documentation I and II, offered by the Canadian Medical Protective Association (CMPA);

• Provide a written summary of each policy, guideline or tool with reference to how it is applicable to general family medicine, including:

o CPSO Medical Records policy #4-12;
o CPSO Test Results Management policy #1-11;
o Ontario Immunization Schedule;
o “Choosing Wisely Canada” Guidelines (Family Medicine section);
o Screening Guidelines for Cervical, Breast and Colon Cancer;
o Abnormal Uterine Bleeding in Pre-Menopausal Women, Journal of Obstetrics and Gynaecology Canada (Volume 35, Number 5, May 2013); and
o Managing Menopause, Journal of Obstetrics and Gynaecology Canada (Volume 36, Number 9, September 2014).

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately six (6) months following the completion of the Education Plan.