Orellana, Cesar Emiliano (CPSO#: 108875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Olser Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Orellana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Orellana ( CPSO# 108875)
Dr. A. Orellana ( CPSO# 108735)

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CESAR EMILIANO ORELLANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORELLANA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 May 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017